Global Patent Index - EP 0869240 B1

EP 0869240 B1 2003-06-18 - Lock fitting for sliding door, sliding window or similar

Title (en)

Lock fitting for sliding door, sliding window or similar

Title (de)

Schlossbeschlag für Schiebetür, Schiebefenster oder ähnliches

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage pour ouvrant coulissant de porte, fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 0869240 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400699 A

Priority

  • FR 9704064 A
  • FR 9707934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869240A1] The mechanism comprises a sliding assembly (4) which moves lengthwise relative to a lock housing (3) and carries a bolt (40). It has an actuator (7) for moving the assembly away from the inner wall (17) of the door or window, and a barrel lock (46) operated by a key (45). The mechanism incorporates a drive (47) which moves lengthwise relative to the lock housing (3) and interacts with the barrel so that it can be moved in one direction or the other by rotating the key. The drive mechanism also has shaped surfaces (111) which interact with similar surfaces on the sliding assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0069 (2013.01); E05B 65/087 (2013.01); Y10S 292/46 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5173 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0957 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1016 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869240 A1 19981007; EP 0869240 B1 20030618; AT 243292 T 20030715; AT 338867 T 20060915; BR 9801223 A 19990427; CN 1197144 A 19981028; DE 69815573 D1 20030724; DE 69815573 T2 20040429; DE 69835839 D1 20061019; DE 69835839 T2 20070412; EP 1288405 A1 20030305; EP 1288405 B1 20060906; ES 2201419 T3 20040316; ES 2272625 T3 20070501; FR 2761724 A1 19981009; FR 2761724 B1 20000204; PT 1288405 E 20070131; PT 869240 E 20031031; TW 405011 B 20000911; US 6050617 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150325

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140326

2015-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150427

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070325

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070325

2005-10-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051004

2005-09-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050926

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERCO INTERNATIONAL FERRURES ET SERRURES DE BATIM

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-01 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040401

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201419 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403593

2003-09-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815573 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PREVOT, GERARD

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ALVAREZ, ERIC

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DESPLANTES, GERARD

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011204

1999-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981013

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE