Global Patent Index - EP 0869246 B1

EP 0869246 B1 2001-12-05 - Lock for the door of a vehicle

Title (en)

Lock for the door of a vehicle

Title (de)

Türschloss für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Serrure pour porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 0869246 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98105434 A

Priority

IT TO970279 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869246A1] Lock (1) for the door of a vehicle, in which a striker mechanism (12) is disposed between an external control lever (13) and an internal control lever (33) of the said lock (1) in order to prevent contemporaneous actuation of the two levers (13, 33), the striker mechanism (12) having a first striker element (48) formed by stamping the external control lever (13) and a second striker element (30) defined by a radial arm (30) extending towards the said first element (48) from a safety lever (27) disposed in a respective position for preventing opening of the lock (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869246 A1 19981007; EP 0869246 B1 20011205; BR 9804622 A 19991109; DE 69802735 D1 20020117; DE 69802735 T2 20020808; ES 2169452 T3 20020701; IT 1292243 B1 19990129; IT TO970279 A1 19981002; PL 189320 B1 20050729; PL 325689 A1 19981012

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140325

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802735

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802735

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-03-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-10-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-07-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169452 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802735 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010314

1999-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981120

1998-11-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOMA ROLTRA S.P.A.

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT