Global Patent Index - EP 0869284 A3

EP 0869284 A3 2000-01-26 - Rotary positive displacement pump

Title (en)

Rotary positive displacement pump

Title (de)

Rotationsverdrängerpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe volumétrique rotative

Publication

EP 0869284 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105932 A

Priority

DE 29705877 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869284A2] The stator of a rotary positive displacement pump has an annular surface extending over the surface of a base plate (3) facing a pressure pad (6) and with inlet (13) and outlet (15). A diaphragm (11) covers the surface and forms a pumping channel with the base plate. A rotor is positioned above the annular surface and has at least one roller (21) which presses the diaphragm locally against the annular surface by acting on the backs of pressure transmission members (14). The members are wedge-shaped and have wedge faces running radially with respect to the concentric axis of annular surface and rotor and bearing against one another without clearance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/12 (2006.01); F04B 43/14 (2006.01); F04C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/12 (2013.01); F04B 43/14 (2013.01); F04C 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29705877 U1 19980219; AT 228208 T 20021215; EP 0869284 A2 19981007; EP 0869284 A3 20000126; EP 0869284 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806310

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALK MAIWALD PATENTANWALTS- UND RECHTSAN, DE

2016-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806310

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALK MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT U, DE

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INOTEC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INOTEC GMBH TRANSPORT- UND FOERDERSYSTEME, 79761 WALDSHUT-TIENGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59806310

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806310

- Representative's name: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806310

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALK MAIWALD PATENTANWALTS- UND RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806310

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALK MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT U, DE

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-05-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806310

- Representative's name: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228208 T

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-11-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INOTEC G.M.B.H. TRANSPORT- UND FORDERSYSTEME

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120418

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: INOTEC GMBH TRANSPORT- UND FOERDERSYSTEME

- Free text: INOTEC GMBH TRANSPORT- UND FOERDERSYSTEME#DAIMLERSTRASSE 9-11#79761 WALDSHUT-TIENGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- INOTEC GMBH TRANSPORT- UND FOERDERSYSTEME#DAIMLERSTRASSE 9-11#79761 WALDSHUT-TIENGEN (DE)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT (SCHWEIZ) MBH;SEEFELDSTRASSE 45;8008 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT (SCHWEIZ) MBH

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0869284E

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021120

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806310 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228208 T 20021215

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 43/14 A, 7F 04B 43/12 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE