Global Patent Index - EP 0869285 B1

EP 0869285 B1 2002-09-11 - Load sensing control with flushing circuit

Title (en)

Load sensing control with flushing circuit

Title (de)

Lastdruckgeführter Förderstromregler mit Spülkreislauf

Title (fr)

Régulateur de débit à détection de charge avec circuit de rinçage

Publication

EP 0869285 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98103929 A

Priority

DE 19713934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869285A2] The regulator is for a hydraulic pump (2), feeding at feed pressure into a working conduit (5) with built-in measuring throttle (6). A scavenging circuit (30,38,40,39) branches off the working conduit upstream of the throttle, to scavenge the inner housing chamber of the pump. The circuit has a scavenging valve (30) connected to a load pressure record line (7). The valve interrupts the scavenging circuit, when the pressure in the load pressure record line exceeds a set first threshold value. When a load pressure is below the set first threshold, the scavenging valve throttles the flow through the scavenging circuit with increasing load pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/08 (2006.01); F04B 53/08 (2006.01); F04B 53/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/18 (2013.01); F04B 49/08 (2013.01); F04B 53/08 (2013.01); F04B 2205/061 (2013.01); F04B 2205/062 (2013.01); F04B 2205/09 (2013.01); F04B 2205/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869285 A2 19981007; EP 0869285 A3 19990922; EP 0869285 B1 20020911; DE 19713934 A1 19981008; DE 19713934 B4 20040603

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090306

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090305

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090305

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090305

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805468 20021017

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020307

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991013

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE