EP 0869318 A1 19981007 - Safety device for a stove with direct measuring of the rate of a gas production
Title (en)
Safety device for a stove with direct measuring of the rate of a gas production
Title (de)
Sicherheitsvorrichtung für einen Ofen mit direkter Messung der Produktionsrate von Gas
Title (fr)
Dispositif de sécurité pour poêle mesurant directement le taux d'une production gazeuse
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 9704433 A 19970404
Abstract (en)
For stoves burning e.g. liquid fuel on wicks, combustion is controlled by battery-powered (6) microprocessor unit (B), with associated thermostat (9) and manual switch (11), altering wick height through an actuator (10). A monitor (7) shuts the stove down on battery failure. Arrangements for other fuels are generally similar. In the gas level detector (C), a thermal sensor (4) responds to a thin-film resistance heater (3), indicating the thermal conductivity of the ambient gas. Levels measured by Wheatstone bridge (5) pass, amplified (2) to the controller (B), which shuts the stove down if a set carbon dioxide level is exceeded. A discriminator (D) especially prevents shut-downs due to other gases.
Abstract (fr)
L'invention concerne un dispositif de sécurité pour appareil de chauffage à combustible solide, liquide ou gazeux, caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte un ensemble de détection (C) composé principalement d'un micro-capteur choisi dans l'ensemble (micro-capteur à conductivité thermique, micro-capteur catalytique, micro-capteur à oxyde semi-conducteur) qui détecte la production d'un gaz dangereux ou non désiré dans l'environnement de l'appareil et informe un ensemble électronique de commande (B), celui-ci provoquant l'arrêt de l'appareil dès qu'un taux prédéterminé dudit gaz est atteint. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 5/003 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- US 4493634 A 19850115 - YANG JERRY S C [TW]
- EP 0075602 A1 19830406 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
- FR 2731776 A1 19960920 - DTN FR SA [FR]
- FR 2671406 A1 19920710 - AM CHAMRCEUN RITH [FR]
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 0440828 A1 19910814 - GAZZAZ HESHAM HASSAN [SA]
- [X] EP 0358925 A2 19900321 - SEIKO CO LTD [JP]
- [A] US 5418131 A 19950523 - BUTTS CHARLES G [US]
- [A] EP 0511582 A1 19921104 - EUROGIADA S R L [IT]
- [A] EP 0439950 A1 19910807 - HONEYWELL INC [US]
- [AD] US 4493634 A 19850115 - YANG JERRY S C [TW]
- [AD] FR 2671406 A1 19920710 - AM CHAMRCEUN RITH [FR]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 011 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 183 (M - 703) 28 May 1988 (1988-05-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 607 (M - 1707) 18 November 1994 (1994-11-18)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
BE DE ES FR IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0869318 A1 19981007; EP 0869318 B1 20020918; DE 69807967 D1 20021024; ES 2184215 T3 20030401; FR 2761756 A1 19981009; FR 2761756 B1 19990604
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98470009 A 19980403; DE 69807967 T 19980403; ES 98470009 T 19980403; FR 9704433 A 19970404