Global Patent Index - EP 0869338 B8

EP 0869338 B8 2009-02-18 - Dosing container

Title (en)

Dosing container

Title (de)

Dosierbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient doseur

Publication

EP 0869338 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 97116934 A

Priority

DE 29705992 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869338A2] The dispensing container has a suction tube (48) within the container and supports (12,16) for orienting the container (10) in at least two preset positions. In the first position, the volume of the container under the tube is larger than in the second position. Alternatively, an inlet opening of the tube can be placed in at least two preset positions. In a first of these positions, the partial volume under the tube inlet is larger than in the second position. The container can be supported in the alternative positions by two support faces (12,16).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 11/00 (2006.01); G01F 11/28 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01); G01F 11/26 (2006.01); G01F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 19/00 (2013.01); G01F 11/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29705992 U1 19980730; AT 414262 T 20081115; DE 59712981 D1 20081224; EP 0869338 A2 19981007; EP 0869338 A3 19991117; EP 0869338 B1 20081112; EP 0869338 B8 20090218; JP 4531872 B2 20100825; JP H10281849 A 19981023; US 6244471 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59712981

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712981 P 20081224

2008-11-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DUERR DENTAL AG

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000415

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6G 01F 11/28 A, 6G 01F 19/00 B, 6B 65D 83/14 B

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT