Global Patent Index - EP 0869408 A4

EP 0869408 A4 2000-11-02 - VOLUME HOLOGRAM LAMINATE AND LABEL FOR PREPARING VOLUME HOLOGRAM LAMINATE

Title (en)

VOLUME HOLOGRAM LAMINATE AND LABEL FOR PREPARING VOLUME HOLOGRAM LAMINATE

Title (de)

MEHRSCHICHTIGES VOLUMENHOLOGRAMM UND ETIKETT ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN VOLUMENHOLOGRAMMS

Title (fr)

STRATIFIE AVEC HOLOGRAMME EN RELIEF ET ETIQUETTE PERMETTANT DE PREPARER UN TEL STRATIFIE AVEC HOLOGRAMME EN RELIEF

Publication

EP 0869408 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97940377 A

Priority

  • JP 9703242 W
  • JP 24802296 A
  • JP 25198696 A
  • JP 25198796 A
  • JP 25198896 A
  • JP 25210796 A
  • JP 28370996 A
  • JP 28675296 A
  • JP 31461396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6066378A] PCT No. PCT/JP97/03242 Sec. 371 Date Mar. 15, 1999 Sec. 102(e) Date Mar. 15, 1999 PCT Filed Dec. 9, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO98/12607 PCT Pub. Date Mar. 26, 1998A multilayered volume hologram structure of the invention comprises a substrate 2 for a certificate or the like, and an adhesive layer 5, a volume hologram layer 5 and a surface protective film 7 laminated on the substrate in the described order. When a multilayer structure consisting of the volume hologram layer 5 and surface protective layer 5 is forcibly released from the substrate for the purpose of making a photograph replacement or falsifying a personal information area, the volume hologram image can break down certainly, thereby ensuring prevention of falsification. A multilayered volume hologram structure-making label is useful for making a multilayered volume hologram structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03H 1/18; B42D 15/10; G03H 1/02; G03H 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); G03H 1/02 (2006.01); G03H 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03H 1/02 (2013.01); B42D 25/328 (2013.01); G03H 1/0248 (2013.01); G03H 1/0256 (2013.01); G09F 3/0292 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01); G03H 1/0011 (2013.01); G03H 1/202 (2013.01); G03H 2001/0413 (2013.01); G03H 2001/186 (2013.01); G03H 2001/2231 (2013.01); G03H 2240/50 (2013.01); G03H 2240/55 (2013.01); G03H 2250/10 (2013.01); G03H 2250/12 (2013.01); G03H 2250/35 (2013.01); G03H 2250/37 (2013.01); G03H 2250/39 (2013.01); G03H 2250/40 (2013.01); G03H 2250/42 (2013.01); G03H 2250/44 (2013.01); G03H 2260/12 (2013.01); G03H 2260/30 (2013.01); G03H 2270/12 (2013.01); G09F 2003/028 (2013.01); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01); Y10S 428/915 (2013.01); Y10T 428/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1405 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1414 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1429 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1452 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1462 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1467 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1471 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1476 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1481 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1486 (2013.01); Y10T 428/149 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1495 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24851 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2486 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24868 (2013.01); Y10T 428/25 (2013.01); Y10T 428/252 (2013.01); Y10T 428/254 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2982 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6066378 A 20000523; DE 69739712 D1 20100204; EP 0869408 A1 19981007; EP 0869408 A4 20001102; EP 0869408 B1 20091223; EP 0869408 B2 20150429; EP 2141553 A2 20100106; EP 2141553 A3 20100120; EP 2251209 A2 20101117; EP 2251209 A3 20111123; EP 2253481 A2 20101124; EP 2253481 A3 20111123; EP 2254003 A2 20101124; EP 2254003 A3 20111116; EP 2254004 A2 20101124; EP 2254004 A3 20111123; EP 2254005 A2 20101124; EP 2254005 A3 20111123; EP 2254006 A2 20101124; EP 2254006 A3 20111123; US 2003104155 A1 20030605; US 2003129344 A1 20030710; US 2003129345 A1 20030710; US 2003134072 A1 20030717; US 6506468 B1 20030114; US 6815027 B2 20041109; US 6835430 B2 20041228; US 6887546 B2 20050503; US 7910186 B2 20110322; WO 9812607 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-03 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69739712

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-04-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2015-04-29 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69739712

2015-04-29 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03H 1/02 20060101ALI20150323BHEP

2015-04-29 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B42D 25/328 20140101ALI20150323BHEP

2015-04-29 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03H 1/18 20060101AFI20150323BHEP

2015-04-29 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03H 1/04 20060101ALI20150323BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03H 1/18 20060101AFI20131024BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03H 1/04 20060101ALI20131024BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B42D 15/10 20060101ALI20131024BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03H 1/02 20060101ALI20131024BHEP

2010-11-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH

- Effective date: 20100923

2010-02-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69739712 P 20100204

2009-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-12-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060921

2000-11-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03H 1/18 A, 7B 42D 15/10 B, 7G 03H 1/04 B, 7G 03H 1/02 B

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980901

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB