Global Patent Index - EP 0869411 A3

EP 0869411 A3 2000-12-27 - Moon phase dial mechanism

Title (en)

Moon phase dial mechanism

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Anzeigen der Mondphasen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'indication des phases de la lune

Publication

EP 0869411 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98302573 A

Priority

GB 9706614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869411A2] A moon-phase dial mechanism comprising two overlapping, rotatable discs behind a substantially circular window representative of the moon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/268 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869411 A2 19981007; EP 0869411 A3 20001227; GB 9706614 D0 19970521

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20041022

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL