Global Patent Index - EP 0869461 A3

EP 0869461 A3 2000-02-23 - Data receiving apparatus and received data processing method for use therein

Title (en)

Data receiving apparatus and received data processing method for use therein

Title (de)

Datenempfangsvorrichtung und Verarbeitungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif récepteur de données et méthode de traitement de ces données

Publication

EP 0869461 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98105799 A

Priority

  • JP 8163597 A
  • JP 1589998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869461A2] A pager has a starting condition memory (9m). In this memory (9m), subprograms which are invalid in normal cases, received data, and subprogram starting conditions which are fulfilled when specific data is input from a key input section, are listed in association with each other. When one of the subprogram starting conditions stored in the starting condition memory (9m) is fulfilled, a corresponding one of the subprograms is started to execute a message display control process, an alarm control process and/or the like. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/16 (2006.01); G08B 5/22 (2006.01); H04Q 7/16 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 5/229 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869461 A2 19981007; EP 0869461 A3 20000223; EP 0869461 B1 20030514; CN 100385800 C 20080430; CN 1148016 C 20040428; CN 1198050 A 19981104; CN 1497859 A 20040519; DE 69814511 D1 20030618; DE 69814511 T2 20031120; HK 1016307 A1 20040408; ID 20097 A 19981001; JP 3921777 B2 20070530; JP H10336054 A 19981218

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814511 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010724

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980330

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB