Global Patent Index - EP 0869465 A3

EP 0869465 A3 2000-01-12 - Remote control with a wireless transmitter transferring an identification signal

Title (en)

Remote control with a wireless transmitter transferring an identification signal

Title (de)

Fernbedienungseinrichtung mit einem Sender für ein drahtlos übermitteltes Freigabesignal

Title (fr)

Dispositif de télécommande à émetteur sans fil transférant un signal d'identification

Publication

EP 0869465 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105827 A

Priority

DE 19713607 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869465A2] The remote-control device provides a release signal for operation of an automobile central locking system, a garage door, or an immobiliser only when the authorisation of the user of the remote-control device has been verified. The remote-control transmitter (1) may be activated directly by insertion of a key (5) in the housing of the remote-control device and/or an identification code is read from a chip card and/or a manual identification code is entered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G08C 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G08C 19/28 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00428 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00476 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00507 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869465 A2 19981007; EP 0869465 A3 20000112; DE 19713607 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081104

2008-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080623

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08C 17/02 A, 7E 05B 49/00 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT