Global Patent Index - EP 0869542 A3

EP 0869542 A3 2001-03-28 - Cleaning and drying apparatus, wafer processing system and wafer processing method

Title (en)

Cleaning and drying apparatus, wafer processing system and wafer processing method

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Reinigen und Trocknen, Scheibenprozesssystem und Scheibenprozessverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage et séchage, système de traitement des plaquettes et méthode de traitement des plaquettes

Publication

EP 0869542 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98302356 A

Priority

  • JP 9980397 A
  • JP 11878497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869542A2] A drying unit is disposed above a cleaning tank containing a cleaning liquid for cleaning semiconductor wafers W. A wafer boat holding semiconductor wafers moves between the cleaning tank and the drying unit. The drying unit has a fixed base surrounding an opening formed in the cleaning tank, a liftable top cover placed on the fixed base, and an O ring interposed between the fixed base and the liftable top cover. The liftable top cover can be moved vertically by a first lifting means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/67028 (2013.01); H01L 21/67781 (2013.01); Y10S 134/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869542 A2 19981007; EP 0869542 A3 20010328; EP 0869542 B1 20060315; DE 69833832 D1 20060511; DE 69833832 T2 20060831; DE 69842125 D1 20110317; EP 1635380 A1 20060315; EP 1635380 B1 20110202; KR 100395997 B1 20031201; TW 434671 B 20010516; US 6068002 A 20000530; US 6171403 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833832

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833832

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090327

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080402

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833832 P 20060511

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-03-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040415

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB