Global Patent Index - EP 0869725 B1

EP 0869725 B1 2001-03-07 - PACKAGING

Title (en)

PACKAGING

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 0869725 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96942447 A

Priority

  • GB 9603087 W
  • GB 9526077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9722277A1] A presentation case suitable for one or two writing instruments has a base (1) with an insert (10) for gripping and holding one pen/pencil, and a cover (2) hinged to the base and having an insert (11) for gripping and holding a second pen/pencil in a position alongside and in close juxtaposition to the first pen/pencil when the case is closed. The gripping inserts have inclined ribs (16) on their gripping surfaces to prevent longitudinal displacement of the gripped pen/pencil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9722277 A1 19970626; AR 005003 A1 19990407; BR 9612076 A 19990217; CO 4520139 A1 19971015; DE 69612015 D1 20010412; DE 69612015 T2 20010906; EP 0869725 A1 19981014; EP 0869725 B1 20010307; GB 9526077 D0 19960221; JP 2000502018 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-12-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612015 20010412

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990121

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980715

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB