Global Patent Index - EP 0869726 B1

EP 0869726 B1 2001-03-07 - REFILLABLE SOFT LEAD PENCIL

Title (en)

REFILLABLE SOFT LEAD PENCIL

Title (de)

WEICHMINENSTIFT

Title (fr)

CRAYON A MINE TENDRE

Publication

EP 0869726 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97936678 A

Priority

  • DE 19630906 A
  • EP 9704144 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19630906A1] A refillable pencil, in particular a soft lead pencil, has a sleeve-shaped shaft (1) with a front and a rear end, a pushing rod (3) coaxially arranged in the shaft (1) and fixed at one end to the rear en of the shaft, seen in the axial direction, a lead (5) joined to the free end of the pushing rod (3) and a sleeve-shaped front part (2) which encloses the lead (5) over at least part of its length. The front part co-operates with the shaft in the manner of a helical gear and can be retracted therein when rotated relative to the shaft (1). This soft lead pencil is characterised in that the lead (5) is rotatively joined to the pushing rod (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 23/016 (2006.01); A45D 40/20 (2006.01); B43K 21/027 (2006.01); B43K 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 21/027 (2013.01); B43K 21/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19630906 A1 19980205; AT 199489 T 20010315; EP 0869726 A1 19981014; EP 0869726 B1 20010307; ES 2157082 T3 20010801; JP H11513923 A 19991130; US 6149331 A 20001121; WO 9805235 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20031022

2004-06-16 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20031022

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FABER- CASTELL AG

2002-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: A.W. FABER- CASTELL UNTERNEHMENSVERWALTUNG G.M.B.

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHWANHAEUSSER INDUSTRIE HOLDING GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157082 T3

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-06-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: IPSER S.R.L.

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703103 20010412

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199489 T 20010315

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000605

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980227

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE