Global Patent Index - EP 0869841 B1

EP 0869841 B1 2003-06-04 - FOAM GENERATING DEVICE

Title (en)

FOAM GENERATING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHAUMSTOFFHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE GENERATION DE MOUSSE

Publication

EP 0869841 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97931836 A

Priority

  • FR 9701167 W
  • FR 9608162 A
  • FR 9610947 A
  • FR 9700690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800227A1] The invention discloses a device generating foam by Venturi effect, mixing a product in liquid phase and a product in gaseous phase, comprising a nozzle (1) for admitting the liquid, coaxial with a Venturi stage (22) comprising a mixer head (18) located opposite the nozzle (1), the neck of which is of diameter "D", and a gas inlet (3) coaxial with the nozzle (1) communicating with the mixer head (18), the gas being sucked in by venturi effect and directed towards a mixing chamber (4) connected to a foam outlet. It is characterised in that, the mixture of the two phases being carried out in a free jet, the mixing injector (13) of the Venturi (22) comprises at least three gradually tapering zones, with gaps between the zones producing a cavitation effect, and opens into a whirl chamber (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 11/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/00 (2006.01); B05B 7/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/24 (2006.01); B05B 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/043 (2013.01); B01F 5/0403 (2013.01); B01F 5/0406 (2013.01); B01F 5/0426 (2013.01); B01F 11/0266 (2013.01); B05B 7/0018 (2013.01); B05B 7/0425 (2013.01); B05B 7/0458 (2013.01); B05B 7/2494 (2013.01); B01F 3/04446 (2013.01); B01F 2005/0448 (2013.01); B05B 17/06 (2013.01); Y10S 261/26 (2013.01); Y10S 261/75 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800227 A1 19980108; AT 242044 T 20030615; CA 2231338 A1 19980108; DE 69722583 D1 20030710; EP 0869841 A1 19981014; EP 0869841 B1 20030604; US 6042089 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEURTAUX S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722583 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEIN, CHRISTOPHE

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEURTAUX S.A.S.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEURTAUX S.A.S.

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980320

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE