Global Patent Index - EP 0869853 B1

EP 0869853 B1 2001-05-30 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS THIN SLAB METAL CASTING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS THIN SLAB METAL CASTING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STRANGGIESSEN VON DÜNNBRAMMEN AUS METALL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COULEE CONTINUE DE BRAMES FINES DE METAL

Publication

EP 0869853 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96946181 A

Priority

  • DE 9602375 W
  • DE 19549275 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19549275C1] The design of a concasting mould in the area where the immersion tube contacts the melt in the mould is such that St1/(S11/2)/Lt1/L11>1 where: St1 is the gap between the outer surface of the immersion tube and the inner surface of the mould; S11 is half the gap between the inner walls of the mould are parallel; and Lt1 and L11 are respectively the cooling rates in the wide (1) and narrow (2) walls of the mould.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/103 (2006.01); B22D 41/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19549275 C1 19970430; AT 201622 T 20010615; AU 1921097 A 19970728; BR 9612374 A 19990713; EP 0869853 A2 19981014; EP 0869853 B1 20010530; ES 2157020 T3 20010801; JP 2000502953 A 20000314; JP 3244508 B2 20020107; RU 2149074 C1 20000520; US 6044898 A 20000404; WO 9724196 A2 19970710; WO 9724196 A3 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051203

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021204

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-12-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011203

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157020 T3

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59607019 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201622 T 20010615

2000-09-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS THIN SLAB METAL CASTING

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991126

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980608

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL