Global patent index - EP 0869901 A4

EP 0869901 A4 2000-10-04 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AND AUTOMATICALLY STABILIZING THE ROTATIONAL MOTION OF A ROTARY WING AIRCRAFT

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AND AUTOMATICALLY STABILIZING THE ROTATIONAL MOTION OF A ROTARY WING AIRCRAFT

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG UND ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN STABILISIERUNG DER GIERBEWEGUNG EINES DREHFLÜGELFLUGZEUGES

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REGULATION ET DE STABILISATION AUTOMATIQUE DU MOUVEMENT DE GIRATION D'UN AERONEF A VOILURE TOURNANTE

Publication

EP 0869901 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96928019 A

Priority

  • US 9612322 W
  • US 155895 P
  • US 707995 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705017A1] In a helicopter (10) having a device for stabilizing yaw motion through the use of a tail rotor (2) with a plurality of rotor blades (11) extending radially from a hollow rotor shaft (15) which is mounted for rotation about a transverse rotor axis (14). The tail rotor (2) is provided with a device (22) for varying the thrust by a pilot input to the blades (11) of the tail rotor (2) and through the use of a gyro rotor (12) for automatic control of the tail rotor (2). The invention further comprises a three point mixing linkage (297) that permits the control of the tail rotor (2) through both the pilot inputs from (296) and the gyro rotor inputs (310).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64C 27/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/82 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705017 A1 19970213; AU 6763296 A 19970226; EP 0869901 A1 19981014; EP 0869901 A4 20001004; JP H11510127 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status

2006-03-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20051024

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020806

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARLTON, PAUL E.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ARLTON, PAUL E.

2000-10-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980227

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB