Global Patent Index - EP 0870014 B9

EP 0870014 B9 2007-10-10 - ALDOLASE CATALYTIC ANTIBODY

Title (en)

ALDOLASE CATALYTIC ANTIBODY

Title (de)

KATALYTISCHER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN ALDOLASE

Title (fr)

ANTICORP CATALYTIQUE ALDOLASE

Publication

EP 0870014 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 96943772 A

Priority

  • US 9620052 W
  • US 57341595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721803A1] Antibodies that catalyse the aldol reaction are generated by immunization with a reactive compound that covalently traps a Lysine (Lys) residue in the binding pocket of the antibody by formation of a stable vinylogous amide, i.e., a covalent antibody/hapten complex. The resultant catalytic antibodies employ a catalytic mechanism which mimics the catalytic mechanism employed by natural class I aldolase enzymes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C07C 45/45 (2006.01); C07C 231/12 (2006.01); C07C 233/33 (2006.01); C07K 16/44 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 5/12 (2006.01); C12N 5/18 (2006.01); C12N 9/88 (2006.01); C12N 15/06 (2006.01); C12P 7/26 (2006.01); C12P 13/00 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 7/26 (2013.01); C12N 9/0002 (2013.01); C12N 9/88 (2013.01); G01N 2333/901 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721803 A1 19970619; AT 354644 T 20070315; AU 1292397 A 19970703; AU 729055 B2 20010125; CA 2239167 A1 19970619; CA 2239167 C 20090922; DE 69636923 D1 20070405; DE 69636923 T2 20071108; DK 0870014 T3 20070611; EP 0870014 A1 19981014; EP 0870014 A4 20020313; EP 0870014 B1 20070221; EP 0870014 B9 20071010; ES 2283009 T3 20071016; JP 3996642 B2 20071024; JP H11510063 A 19990907; PT 870014 E 20070531; SI 0870014 T1 20070831; US 5733757 A 19980331; US 5985626 A 19991116; US 6368839 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161217

2017-05-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161216

2017-03-02 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20070401553

- Effective date: 20161217

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161223

2017-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 354644 T

- Effective date: 20161216

2017-01-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-01-25 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-01-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161215

2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161215

2016-12-19 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20161216

2016-12-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69636923

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20151216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2283009 T3

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070401553

2007-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070517

2007-05-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE S.A.

2007-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69636923 P 20070405

2007-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV RO SI

2007-02-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030708

2002-03-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 9/00 A, 7C 12N 5/12 B, 7C 12P 7/26 B, 7C 12N 9/88 B

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARBAS, CARLOS, F., III

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LERNER, RICHARD, A.

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, JUERGEN

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980715

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980715;LT PAYMENT 980715;LV PAYMENT 980715;RO PAYMENT 980715;SI PAYMENT 980715