Global Patent Index - EP 0870064 B1

EP 0870064 B1 2002-09-18 - MICROCRYSTALLINE SUGARS OR SUGAR-ALCOHOLS; METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME

Title (en)

MICROCRYSTALLINE SUGARS OR SUGAR-ALCOHOLS; METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME

Title (de)

MIKROKRISTALLINE ZUCKER ODER ZUCKERALKOHLE;VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

SUCRES OU ALCOOLS DE SUCRES MICROCRISTALLINS; PROCEDE POUR LES PREPARER

Publication

EP 0870064 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96941694 A

Priority

  • FR 9601931 W
  • FR 9514643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721838A1] A composition containing sugar microcrystals is disclosed. Essentially, the crystals are uniform unbroken single crystals with a regular geometrical shape and a grain size following a Gaussian distribution of which the median is of around 20-220 mu m, while the coefficient of variation is of around 20-50 %, particularly 30-45 %, 35-45 % or 30-40 %. The term "sugar" designates mono-, di- and oligosaccharides, as well as the polyols obtained by their reduction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C13F 1/02; C07H 1/06; C07H 3/04; C13F 3/00; C13K 1/10; C13K 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 1/06 (2006.01); C07H 3/00 (2006.01); C07H 3/02 (2006.01); C07H 3/04 (2006.01); C13B 30/02 (2011.01); C13B 50/00 (2011.01); C13K 1/00 (2006.01); C13K 1/10 (2006.01); C13K 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 30/022 (2013.01); C07H 3/00 (2013.01); C13B 30/026 (2013.01); C13B 50/002 (2013.01); C13K 1/10 (2013.01); C13K 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721838 A1 19970619; AT 224460 T 20021015; AU 1100597 A 19970703; AU 707137 B2 19990701; BR 9611990 A 19990330; CA 2238826 A1 19970619; DE 69623812 D1 20021024; DE 69623812 T2 20030605; DK 0870064 T3 20021104; EP 0870064 A1 19981014; EP 0870064 B1 20020918; ES 2181925 T3 20030301; FR 2742164 A1 19970613; FR 2742164 B1 19990129; HU 9903740 A2 20000328; HU 9903740 A3 20000428; JP 2000501609 A 20000215; PT 870064 E 20030228; US 6015466 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161205

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161203

2016-12-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161203

2016-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69623812

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061204

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-08-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-06-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2007-06-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2006-12-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061205

2006-12-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061204

2005-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-25 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0870064E

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181925 T3

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021218

2003-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-12-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623812 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19980529;LT PAYMENT 19980529;LV PAYMENT 19980529;RO PAYMENT 19980529;SI PAYMENT 19980529

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224460 T 20021015

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEGHIN-SAY S.A.

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020225

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980604

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980529;LT PAYMENT 980529;LV PAYMENT 980529;RO PAYMENT 980529;SI PAYMENT 980529