Global Patent Index - EP 0870080 B1

EP 0870080 B1 2000-03-08 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE FIBERS

Title (en)

ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE FIBERS

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCH LEITENDE FASERN

Title (fr)

FIBRES CONDUCTRICES DE L'ELECTRICITE

Publication

EP 0870080 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95944815 A

Priority

US 9516523 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9722740A1] High strength poly(p-phenylene terephthalamide) fibers are rendered electrically conductive with sulfonic acid ring-substituted polyaniline.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/905 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9722740 A1 19970626; DE 69515531 D1 20000413; DE 69515531 T2 20000810; EP 0870080 A1 19981014; EP 0870080 B1 20000308; JP 2000502408 A 20000229; JP 3764485 B2 20060405; KR 100393509 B1 20031128; KR 20000064439 A 20001106

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515531 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981026

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980518

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL