Global Patent Index - EP 0870157 B1

EP 0870157 B1 2002-11-06 - METHOD OF OPERATING A GAS-TURBINE-POWERED GENERATING SET USING LOW-CALORIFIC-VALUE FUEL

Title (en)

METHOD OF OPERATING A GAS-TURBINE-POWERED GENERATING SET USING LOW-CALORIFIC-VALUE FUEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER GASTURBOGRUPPE MIT NIEDERKALORISCHEM BRENNSTOFF

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UN GROUPE GENERATEUR A TURBINES A GAZ AVEC DU COMBUSTIBLE DE FAIBLE POUVOIR CALORIFIQUE

Publication

EP 0870157 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96940973 A

Priority

  • CH 9600441 W
  • DE 19549140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19549140A1] In the method proposed, the gas-turbined-powered generating set consists essentially of a compressor, a combustion chamber, a turbine and a generator. The low-calorific-value fuel is compressed by a fuel compressor. When the generating set is started up, low-calorific-value fuel (11a) is mixed with part of the combustion air (9, 9a) in more than stoichiometric proportions so that a stable flame is produced. At the latest when the nominal speed (B) has been reached and synchronization has been achieved, the rate of flow of the fuel (11a) is reduced until the proportions are just more than stoichiometric. The rest of the fuel (11b) is mixed in with the rest of the combustion air (9, 9b) to give the required charge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/36; F23R 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 9/28 (2006.01); F02C 9/40 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/28 (2013.01); F23R 3/36 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19549140 A1 19970703; AU 1028697 A 19970728; CN 1119569 C 20030827; CN 1206455 A 19990127; DE 59609859 D1 20021212; EP 0870157 A1 19981014; EP 0870157 B1 20021106; JP 2000502771 A 20000307; JP 4103965 B2 20080618; US 6148603 A 20001121; WO 9724561 A1 19970710

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609859 20021212

2002-11-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011005

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980606

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI NL