Global patent index - EP 0870443 A3

EP 0870443 A3 2000-02-23 - Chair, particularly office-chair

Title (en)

Chair, particularly office-chair

Title (de)

Stuhl, insbesondere Bürostuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise, notamment chaise de bureau

Publication

EP 0870443 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105157 A

Priority

DE 19714546 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870443A2] The seat support (12) can be tilted in relation to the horizontal (30) to synchronise with the tilt of the adjustable backrest support (11). The seat and backrest supports consists of a component (13) at least parts of which are elastically sprung. The seat support consists of a U-shaped part of the component. One of the sides (14) of the U-shaped seat support is positioned on a chair-column (16). The ends of the U-sides are joined by a connecting element (19). The base of the U-shaped seat support forming the front edge (20) of the chair's (10) seat is flexible and is guided along a guide track (21) joined to the chair column.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032; A47C 3/021

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03266 (2013.01); A47C 1/03277 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870443 A2 19981014; EP 0870443 A3 20000223; DE 19714546 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 1/032 A, 7A 47C 3/021 B

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI