Global Patent Index - EP 0870444 A3

EP 0870444 A3 2001-01-17 - Chair

Title (en)

Chair

Title (de)

Stuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise

Publication

EP 0870444 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104245 A

Priority

AT 15197 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870444A2] The spherical-sectioned shell (2) is fixed to the central column (1) of a height-adjustable bottom frame (U) of a swivel office chair. The ball (3) is fixed to the shell by means of a leather ball-cover (4) gripping over the edge of the shell and positively fixed underneath the edge. The cover is opened and closed preferably by sliding clasp fasteners. Two back-rests (5) extend upwards over the ball and are mounted on the underneath frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 9/00; A47C 3/16; A47C 4/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/16 (2006.01); A47C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/405 (2013.01); A47C 3/16 (2013.01); A47C 9/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870444 A2 19981014; EP 0870444 A3 20010117; AT 1995 U1 19980325; DE 29824647 U1 20020103

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-11-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 9/00 A, 7A 47C 3/16 B, 7A 47C 4/54 B

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI