Global Patent Index - EP 0870446 A3

EP 0870446 A3 2000-10-18 - Down covered cloth for a mattress

Title (en)

Down covered cloth for a mattress

Title (de)

Mit Daunen bedecktes Tuch für eine Matratze

Title (fr)

Toile nappée de duvet pour matelas

Publication

EP 0870446 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98400875 A

Priority

FR 9704478 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870446A2] The mattress, e.g. with inner springs or foam and an outer ticking cover, incorporates a layer of down beneath the ticking layer. The down can be attached to a flexible backing layer e.g. of a fine mesh, or directly to the inner surface of the ticking, which can have an adhesive coating to ensure that the down stays in an even layer. The down can be applied, for example, by blowing inside an enclosed chamber while the pre-coated backing layer is unrolled in front of it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] US 5388891 A 19950214 - OKA TAKASHI [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870446 A2 19981014; EP 0870446 A3 20001018; FR 2761869 A1 19981016; FR 2761869 B1 19990702

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 27/00 A

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI