Global patent index - EP 0870448 A3

EP 0870448 A3 2001-01-03 - Furniture for sitting and/or lying

Title (en)

Furniture for sitting and/or lying

Title (de)

Liege-/Sitzmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise et/ou de couchage

Publication

EP 0870448 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100925 A

Priority

DE 19701698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19701698A1] The roller-shaped support elements (30) are positioned adjacent to each other. They are joined at the sides by axles protruding from their two end sides, so that they swivel. Several support elements are combined between rigid frame elements (4-6) into a module joined by link connections (10,13) and fixed in various positions. At least two of the frame elements are swivel joined on both sides by axles (21,22) to a frame which has side rails (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 31/12; A47C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 9/00 (2006.01); A47C 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/143 (2013.01); A47C 7/024 (2013.01); A47C 7/405 (2013.01); A47C 9/002 (2013.01); A47C 13/00 (2013.01); A47C 31/123 (2013.01); A47C 31/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19701698 A1 19980723; EP 0870448 A2 19981014; EP 0870448 A3 20010103

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 31/12 A, 7A 47C 9/00 B

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI