Global Patent Index - EP 0870449 A3

EP 0870449 A3 2001-01-03 - Bed mattress with variable characteristics of carrying capacity throughout its length

Title (en)

Bed mattress with variable characteristics of carrying capacity throughout its length

Title (de)

Matratze mit veränderlichen Trageigenschaften über ihre Länge

Title (fr)

Matelas avec des caractéristiques variables de capacité portante le long de sa longueur

Publication

EP 0870449 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98104069 A

Priority

IT MI970528 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870449A2] Bed mattress, of the type consisting essentially of a stratified expanded-foam panel formed by the arrangement, on top of one another, of at least three layers with different load-bearing and/or air-permeability characteristics. The main layer, which is situated in the middle of the other two layers and is basically assigned the load-bearing function, has a thickness variable along the length of the mattress. Said middle load-bearing layer has high load-bearing characteristics, with small-size closed cells, and its thickness varies from a minimum of about 50 mm, in the region of the neck zone of the sleeping person, to a maximum of about 130 mm, in the region of the trunk and respectively the pelvis of the sleeping person. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/14 (2006.01); A47C 27/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/15 (2013.01); A47C 27/144 (2013.01); A47C 27/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870449 A2 19981014; EP 0870449 A3 20010103; EP 0870449 B1 20030723; AT 245376 T 20030815; DE 69816506 D1 20030828; IT 1290044 B1 19981019; IT MI970528 A1 19980911

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-10-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816506 P 20030828

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

2003-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 27/14 A

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI