Global Patent Index - EP 0870454 A3

EP 0870454 A3 2000-11-02 - A hanger

Title (en)

A hanger

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Cintre

Publication

EP 0870454 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98302630 A

Priority

GB 9707247 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870454A2] A hanger is disclosed on which articles may be supported, the articles being either box structures in which garments are packed, or alternatively garments themselves. The hanger conveniently has a one piece moulded integral structure having a fastening device (6) including at least three sections (2,12,13) interconnected one with the next in series. The sections are conveniently arranged so that a first section (2) extends from the hanger structure, a second section (12) extends from the first section and is pivotally connected thereto, and a third section (13) is pivotable relative to the second section. The arrangement is such that when the sections are pivoted to define a fastening device the second section (12) is folded against the first section (2) and the third section (13) is folded to overlie the second section for securing an article between the second and third sections. Preferably there is provided a securing member (72) for securing third section (46) relative to first (41) and second (43) sections. Conveniently, the securing member is mounted on the first section (41), or alternatively the securing member comprises a spring (72) for securing the first and second section (41,43) together and for securing the third section (46) relative to the second section. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/48; A47G 25/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/20 (2006.01); A47G 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/20 (2013.01); A47G 25/485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870454 A2 19981014; EP 0870454 A3 20001102; EP 0870454 B1 20030521; DE 69814731 D1 20030626; GB 2324029 A 19981014; GB 2324029 B 19990630; GB 9707247 D0 19970528; HK 1013912 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100403

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100403

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2005-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-01-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814731 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI