Global patent index - EP 0870523 A3

EP 0870523 A3 2000-01-12 - Skate track made from individual elements

Title (en)

Skate track made from individual elements

Title (de)

Skate-Anlage aus Einzelelementen

Title (fr)

Piste pour patins fabriquée à partir d'éléments uniques

Publication

EP 0870523 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106025 A

Priority

DE 19714086 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870523A2] The construction (1) is built-up from a number of sections (2,3) which form a hollow track with flat bottom (4) and a number of end sections with which the construction is given a closed semi-circular end. The hollow track consists of concave sections which have flat horizontal platforms (10b) along the top. The platforms are used by the skaters to launch from or to end up on. The skaters can also move along the construction and along the semi-circular end. The concave sections are supported by struts (6,7). A roof can be added to the construction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870523 A2 19981014; EP 0870523 A3 20000112; DE 19714086 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status

2001-03-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 63C 19/10 A, 7E 01C 13/00 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI