Global Patent Index - EP 0870545 B1

EP 0870545 B1 2002-09-25 - Centrifuge with hematocrit readable lid

Title (en)

Centrifuge with hematocrit readable lid

Title (de)

Haematokrit-Zentrifuge mit Ablesedeckel

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse avec couvercle permettant la lecture de l'hématocrite

Publication

EP 0870545 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105497 A

Priority

DE 19715344 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870545A1] The centrifuge consists of a rotor and a transparent lid (2) mounted on the rotor. and is effected by the lid being provided with one or more scales and/or concentration lines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 7/02 (2013.01); B04B 2007/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870545 A1 19981014; EP 0870545 B1 20020925; DE 19715344 A1 19981015; US 6149569 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150326

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150326

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150326

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805655

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805655 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010510

1999-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDREAS HETTICH GMBH & CO. KG

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990217

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI