Global Patent Index - EP 0870554 B1

EP 0870554 B1 2003-06-11 - Rolling train for rolling flat steel

Title (en)

Rolling train for rolling flat steel

Title (de)

Walzenstrasse zum Walzen von Flachstahl

Title (fr)

Train de laminoirs pour laminer des aciers plats

Publication

EP 0870554 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106120 A

Priority

DE 19714216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870554A2] The mill for rolling flat steel billets includes universal roll stands instead of vertical rolls. These stands have adjustable carriers of free vertical roll pairs. The universal roll stands are configured into a compact rolling group for production of profiled sections from a continuously cast billet (VP). The preliminary section of this group consists of a vertical duo stand (VDG) or a universal stand, a horizontal duo stand (HDG), and two tandem stands (TUR) and (TUF) with adjustable vertical rolls (VWR).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 13/12; B21B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 1/12 (2006.01); B21B 13/12 (2006.01); B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/12 (2013.01); B21B 1/12 (2013.01); B21B 1/224 (2013.01); B21B 1/466 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

DE 19714216 A1 19981008; AT 242664 T 20030615; EP 0870554 A2 19981014; EP 0870554 A3 19990602; EP 0870554 B1 20030611; ES 2201358 T3 20040316; JP 4339936 B2 20091007; JP H10277602 A 19981020; US 6058754 A 20000509; US 6085566 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 242664 T

- Effective date: 20180403

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180402

2018-04-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180402

2018-04-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59808667

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59808667

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808667

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2004-06-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201358 T3

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808667 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011009

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980403

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI