Global Patent Index - EP 0870674 A3

EP 0870674 A3 2000-03-29 - Nautical balance system

Title (en)

Nautical balance system

Title (de)

Stabilisierungssystem für Segelboote

Title (fr)

Système stabilisateur pour bâteaux

Publication

EP 0870674 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98105948 A

Priority

  • US 89180797 A
  • UY 24511 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870674A2] A nautical balance system (10) for installation on small sailboats. The system improves the ability of a helmsman to counter the heeling force of the wind on the sails by providing a swinging seat (40) supported by semicircular rail (30) for supporting the weight of the helmsman outboard of the sailboat. The system enables the helmsman to easily use his weight to limit the heel of the sailboat. The system is independent of mast (20) location and provides for tacking under a low boom (22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 9/10; B63B 39/02; B63B 43/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 39/00 (2006.01); B63B 43/08 (2006.01); B63H 9/04 (2006.01); B63H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 43/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 2643628 A 19530630 - LOUIS SVEINSSON

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870674 A2 19981014; EP 0870674 A3 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63H 9/10 A, 7B 63B 43/08 B, 7B 63B 39/02 B

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT MC NL PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI