Global Patent Index - EP 0870718 B1

EP 0870718 B1 2003-06-25 - Gripping device for anchoring a lift cabin

Title (en)

Gripping device for anchoring a lift cabin

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Festsetzen einer Aufzugskabine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien de cabine d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 0870718 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105942 A

Priority

CH 84897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870718A1] The lift cage is connected by a fixture mechanism (24,26,27,34) to the track (5). The mechanism includes a detachable clamping element (13) manually connectable to the track. The chassis supporting the lift cage has grooved blocks (27) inserted into anchor grooves on the track. The grooved blocks are positioned on screws (34) supported by the main body (24). A compression spring coaxial with the screw in the main body automatically pulls the grooved blocks out of the anchor grooves when the screw is loosened. A handle (26) with sleeves (37) for bolts (38) is positioned on the main body. Compression springs (39) on the bolts and coaxial with them push the main body from a support plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/18 (2006.01); B66B 7/02 (2006.01); B66B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/022 (2013.01); B66B 5/18 (2013.01); B66B 7/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870718 A1 19981014; EP 0870718 B1 20030625; AT 243650 T 20030715; CA 2234543 A1 19981011; DE 59808783 D1 20030731; JP H10279221 A 19981020; US 6032763 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808783 P 20030731

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990317

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI