Global Patent Index - EP 0870907 B1

EP 0870907 B1 2001-12-05 - Cranckase ventilating system

Title (en)

Cranckase ventilating system

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entlüftung eines Kurbelgehäuses

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aération de carter

Publication

EP 0870907 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104888 A

Priority

DE 19715233 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870907A1] The system comprises a pipe (3) leading from the crankcase to an outlet in the engine intake pipe. The crankcase (2) contains a second pipe (4), the air inlets (6, 8) of the two pipes being so situated that with the vehicle level one at least of them is above the level (7) of the oil in the sump (5). When the oil in the sump shifts due to travelling over a steep slope, one at least of these inlets is below the oil level. When in the horizontal position a section (18) of the second pipe can protrude into the sump, this section joining onto a standpipe (17) to which the first pipe is connected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 13/02; F01M 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/06 (2006.01); F01M 13/02 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/067 (2013.01); F01M 13/02 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0444 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870907 A1 19981014; EP 0870907 B1 20011205; DE 19715233 C1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802286

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-03-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2003-11-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-02-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802286 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIELER, JENS

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUERWALD, MARIO

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERNER, PETER

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZINK, HARALD

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980721

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI