Global Patent Index - EP 0870908 B1

EP 0870908 B1 2001-12-05 - Crankcase ventilation system for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Crankcase ventilation system for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Entlüftungsvorrichtung für ein Kurbelgehäuse einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Systeme de ventilation de carter de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0870908 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104570 A

Priority

DE 19715061 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870908A1] The breather incorporates an oil-separator forming part of the cylinder-head cover. S-bends in the separator are formed by a portion integral with the cover, and a bottom portion. A suction union of the separator is connected to the engine intake, and it also has an oil outlet, the bends being formed by ribs on the top portion. The separator (6) slopes downwards from the inlet to the outlet (15), both in the lengthwise and the transverse direction of the engine. At the outlet is an oil drain pipe (18) protruding into an oil pocket (19), the latter being formed by a weir (20) in the cylinder-head. The cover (3) can fit over a camshaft chamber (5) and a shaft for the driving chain, both of these containing ribs forming an initial separator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/0416 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0488 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3509439 A1 19850926 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870908 A1 19981014; EP 0870908 B1 20011205; DE 19715061 A1 19981015; DE 19715061 C2 19990121; ES 2168695 T3 20020616

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802287

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-11-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-03-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168695 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-03-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802287 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980721

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI