Global Patent Index - EP 0870910 B1

EP 0870910 B1 2003-06-04 - Exhaust gas purification device

Title (en)

Exhaust gas purification device

Title (de)

Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'épuration de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 0870910 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105368 A

Priority

DE 19714851 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870910A2] The exhaust gas cleaning device includes a casing (3) and at least one basically cylindrical exhaust gas cleaning body (1) with intermediate switching between bearing elements (2', 2"). The casing includes a tubular bearing sector and two transition cones (5) at the ends. It is divided into at least one plane running perpendicular to the longitudinal axis (7). The bearing sector is made conical, at least in some regions, widening towards the dividing plane. The annular cavity widens, at least in regions, towards the dividing plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1894 (2013.01); F01N 3/2853 (2013.01); F01N 2450/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19714851 C1 19981001; EP 0870910 A2 19981014; EP 0870910 A3 19991215; EP 0870910 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-05-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808572 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZEUNA-STAERKER GMBH & CO KG

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-08-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI