Global Patent Index - EP 0870928 B1

EP 0870928 B1 2003-06-18 - Circulating centrifugal pump for a diswasher

Title (en)

Circulating centrifugal pump for a diswasher

Title (de)

Umwälz-Kreiselpumpe für Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifuge de circulation pour lave-vaiselle

Publication

EP 0870928 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98105074 A

Priority

DE 19714924 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870928A1] The invention relates to a circulating centrifugal pump for a dishwasher with a pump casing with an axial inlet opening and a radial outlet opening, and with a pump chamber expanding in a spiral shape with a spur (17), and in which there is rotarily mounted a round pump rotor (20) with a predetermined distance from the spur (17), and whose vanes (16) are disposed on a support disc (12). A noticeable reduction in noise during operation can be achieved in a simple way in that the diameter of the ends of the vanes (16) is reduced relative to the diameter of the support disc (12), and the radial spacing (b) of the ends of the vanes from the spur is correspondingly enlarged compared to the radial spacing (a) of the support disc from the spur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/66; F04D 29/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/669 (2013.01); F04D 29/428 (2013.01); F05B 2260/96 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870928 A1 19981014; EP 0870928 B1 20030618; ES 2200225 T3 20040301

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170320

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170320

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170320

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815583

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120321

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120321

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110311

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200225 T3

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815583 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990406

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI