Global Patent Index - EP 0870931 B1

EP 0870931 B1 2001-05-23 - Actuator with end-of-stroke-cushioning

Title (en)

Actuator with end-of-stroke-cushioning

Title (de)

Endlagengedämpfter Arbeitszylinder

Title (fr)

Vérin avec dispositif amortisseur de fin de course

Publication

EP 0870931 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101226 A

Priority

DE 29706364 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5953976A] An end dampened working cylinder for a fluid which serves as a fluid power medium for transmission of energy, the working cylinder comprising a main piston; control plungers carrying ring magnets and mounted on both sides of the main piston; springs form-locking the control plungers with the main piston and piston rod; sensors incorporated in a topside end and a bottom end and reacting to a contactless magnetic field, so that on approaching the ring magnet but at least on reaching a sealing rest position of the control plunger at each of the end stops a signal of a respective one of the sensors is generated and serves for controlling the fluid power, the control plungers sliding along the piston rod so as to provide adjustable and guaranteed sealing, outlet channels and a throttled flow-off channel, the control plungers serving as a shut-off component and valve for the outlet channels, so that when the control plungers rest on the topside end and the bottom end a dampening space is formed, from which a dampened fluid outlet through the throttled flow-off channel provides an external means of adjustment in form of a throttle adjustment screw.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/22; F15B 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/222 (2013.01); F15B 15/223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29706364 U1 19970619; AT 201483 T 20010615; EP 0870931 A1 19981014; EP 0870931 B1 20010523; US 5953976 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59800746

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110124

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100124

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100124

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800746 20010628

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201483 T 20010615

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000327

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

1998-12-11 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1998-12-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-11-09 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI CASETTA & PERANI S.P.A.

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980124

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)