Global Patent Index - EP 0870960 A3

EP 0870960 A3 2000-09-27 - Coupling device for a control valve in a multi-component metering installation

Title (en)

Coupling device for a control valve in a multi-component metering installation

Title (de)

Kupplungsvorrichtung für ein Steuerventil in einer Mehrkomponenten-Dosieranlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accouplement pour une vanne de régulation dans une installation de dosage pour plusieurs composants

Publication

EP 0870960 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106003 A

Priority

  • DE 19714328 A
  • DE 29802741 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870960A2] The coupling system for dosing valves, in a multi-component dosing assembly, has a closing body (AK) of a dosing valve (DVx) at each coupling counter piece (2). In the uncoupled setting (P0), the coupling piece (3) is moved by a slide along a rail (5) with the dosing valves to a given dosing valve (DVx) to be operated. In the coupled position, the coupling piece (3) and the counter piece (2) form a control valve for the dosing valve (DVx) to be used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 31/06; B01F 13/10; G05D 11/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/026 (2013.01); B01F 15/0454 (2013.01); B01F 2215/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870960 A2 19981014; EP 0870960 A3 20000927; EP 0870960 B1 20030115; EP 0870960 B3 20100210

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140402

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140402

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806903

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806903

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130410

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130415

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-19 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KAMINSKI HARMANN PATENTANWAELTE EST.

2010-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: BESCHRAENKUNGANTRAG GUTGEHEISSEN

2010-02-04 [REG DE 8505] EP PATENT AMENDED AFTER LIMITATION PROCEEDINGS AT EPO

2008-11-05 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Filing date: 20080917

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806903 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MULTI-COMPONENT METERING INSTALLATION WITH COUPLING DEVICE

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 16K 31/06 A, 7G 05D 11/13 B, 7B 01F 13/10 B

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI