Global Patent Index - EP 0870979 A3

EP 0870979 A3 2000-01-05 - Luminaire comprising an adjustable reflector

Title (en)

Luminaire comprising an adjustable reflector

Title (de)

Leuchte mit einem verstellbaren Reflektor

Title (fr)

Luminaire avec un réflecteur ajustable

Publication

EP 0870979 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106625 A

Priority

DE 19714662 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870979A2] The lamp (1) has a base supporting a light source (6) and an associated rear reflector (5), which is adjustable relative to the light source via an adjustment device (4) for alternating the direction of the output beam. The angle between the reflector axis and the centre axis of the light source may be adjustable continuously by pivoting the reflector about an axis (17) transverse to the centre axis of the light source. The reflector may be further adjusted by movement parallel to the centre axis of the light source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/02; F21V 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 7/16 (2006.01); F21V 7/18 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01); F21V 17/02 (2006.01); F21V 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2013.01); F21V 7/16 (2013.01); F21V 7/18 (2013.01); F21V 14/04 (2013.01); F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21V 21/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870979 A2 19981014; EP 0870979 A3 20000105; EP 0870979 B1 20041027; AT 280925 T 20041115; DE 19714662 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812157

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120702

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 280925 T

- Effective date: 20110409

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZUMTOBEL STAFF GMBH

- Free text: ZUMTOBEL STAFF GMBH#SCHWEIZER STRASSE 30#6850 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- ZUMTOBEL STAFF GMBH#SCHWEIZER STRASSE 30#6850 DORNBIRN (AT)

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812157 P 20041202

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020419

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI