Global Patent Index - EP 0871020 A3

EP 0871020 A3 2000-01-12 - Container with flexible inner part

Title (en)

Container with flexible inner part

Title (de)

Behälter mit einem flexiblen Innenteil

Title (fr)

Conteneur avec une partie centrale flexible

Publication

EP 0871020 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106250 A

Priority

DE 29706183 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6011223A] The invention relates to a container with a flexible internal part (6), particularly suitable for weighing bulk material, comprising a closure mechanism within the exit area of the internal part (6) as well as at least two partial exits (18, 19) to be charged, located at the internal part (6) for further processing said bulk material. By means of said locking mechanism, it is practicable to press at least one partial area of the flexible internal part (6) laterally from outside against a sword (14) which is located inside within the exit area of the internal part. This way, said sword (14) separates the partial exits (18, 19) from each other, whereby in each case, one of the partial exits (18, 19) is closable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01G 13/18; B65D 90/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29706183 U1 19980806; EP 0871020 A2 19981014; EP 0871020 A3 20000112; IL 123997 A 20010614; US 6011223 A 20000104

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030407

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MHT MATERIAL HANDLING TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI