EP 0871065 A1 19981014 - Method for processing a silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material
Title (en)
Method for processing a silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material
Title (de)
Verarbeitungsverfahren für ein lichtempfindliches, photographisches Silberhalogenidfarbmaterial
Title (fr)
Procédé de traitement d'un matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 10243597 A 19970407
Abstract (en)
There is disclosed a method for processing a silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material, which comprises after subjecting a silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material exposed to light imagewise, to color-development, bleaching the light-sensitive material, wherein the bleaching is carried out using a bleaching solution containing an iron(III) complex salt of an aminopolycarboxylic acid compound of the formula (I): <CHEM> wherein R1 represents a hydrogen atom, an aliphatic hydrocarbon group, an aryl group, or a heterocyclic group, L1 and L2 each represent an alkylene group, and M1 and M2 each represent a hydrogen atom or a cation, with the replenishment being made with a bleaching replenisher (2), and wherein after the overflow (6) from a bleaching bath (4) resulting from the replenishment is regenerated with a bleaching-solution-regenerating agent (13) in an amount smaller than the amount of the color developer, per square meter of the light-sensitive material to be processed, carried into the bleaching bath from a color-developing bath, the overflow is used as the bleaching replenisher (2). According to this method, when a regenerated bleaching solution is used, stain and fogging are suppressed, bubbling at the time of regeneration is suppressed, the efficiency of the regeneration operation is improved, and a bleaching solution can be regenerated and used without impairing the bleaching performance, with the load on the environment reduced. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5580705 A 19961203 - UEDA YUTAKA [JP], et al
- [X] US 5153111 A 19921006 - YOSHIDA KAZUAKI [JP], et al
- [X] US 4923785 A 19900508 - FRANK KARL [DE]
- [A] EP 0329088 A2 19890823 - KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]
- [A] EP 0488233 A1 19920603 - FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]
- [A] EP 0512318 A2 19921111 - AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]
- [A] COOLEY A ET AL: "FACTORS LIMITING THE RECOVERY, REGENERATION, AND REUSE OF PHOTOGRAPHIC PROCESSING SOLUTIONS", JOURNAL OF IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 37, no. 6, 1 November 1993 (1993-11-01), pages 603 - 606, XP000422491
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 352 (P - 1248) 6 September 1991 (1991-09-06)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 005 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0871065 A1 19981014; EP 0871065 B1 20020828; AT E223075 T1 20020915; DE 69807383 D1 20021002; DE 69807383 T2 20030109
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98106286 A 19980406; AT 98106286 T 19980406; DE 69807383 T 19980406