Global Patent Index - EP 0871081 B1

EP 0871081 B1 2001-12-05 - Method and apparatus for lightweight corona device shield mounting

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for lightweight corona device shield mounting

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Befestigen einer leichten Koronaabschirmung

Title (fr)

Procédé et moyens pour monter le blindage léger d'un dispositif de corona

Publication

EP 0871081 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98302602 A

Priority

US 83793097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5812359A] A lightweight easily installed shield for a corona generating device. A frame to support the end blocks and provide a structural member for a corona generating device is provided. The shield for the corona generating device is made of a lightweight, thin conductive material such as stainless steel and are formed so that they have a generally bowed out cross section prior to installation in the frame. To install the shield in the frame it is squeezed together and inserted in the frame. Once released the resilient bias of the steel causes the shield to be restrained within the frame and can be accurately located and retained by using a locating pin or ridge formed in the frame. The shield described allows easy and accurate assembly of the corona generating device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08; G03G 15/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/02 (2006.01); G03G 15/16 (2006.01); H01T 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0291 (2013.01); H01T 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5812359 A 19980922; DE 69802743 D1 20020117; DE 69802743 T2 20020523; EP 0871081 A1 19981014; EP 0871081 B1 20011205; JP H10301367 A 19981113

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080402

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080402

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070411

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-27 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20050404

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802743 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990813

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990414

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI