Global Patent Index - EP 0871188 B1

EP 0871188 B1 2000-09-06 - Key-controlled safety switch

Title (en)

Key-controlled safety switch

Title (de)

Schlüsselsicherheitsschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de sécurité à clé

Publication

EP 0871188 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97117694 A

Priority

IT VI970054 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0871188A1] A key-controlled safety switch includes a box-like case (2) with a longitudinal axis (L) which internally accommodates a series of fixed electric contacts (4, 5) and moving electric contacts (6, 7) which are suitable to interact in order to change the state of the switch, and an actuation head with a prism-shaped cap (3) which has, on opposite sides of an end edge (14), two slots (12, 13) for the insertion of a key-type actuator (15) along two mutually perpendicular directions ( alpha , beta ), wherein the head (3) supports a cam (16) for the actuation of the moving contacts (6, 7) which can rotate about a substantially transverse pin (H), and locking devices for the cam (16) which include at least one slider (39) which can slide substantially at right angles to the rotation axis of the cam. The slider (39) and the cam (16) can be actuated exclusively with the key-type actuator (15). The direction of the sliding of the slider (39) is substantially perpendicular to the rotation axis (18) of the cam and is inclined with respect to both of the insertion directions of the actuator. The slots (12, 13) for the insertion of the actuator are substantially equidistant from the end edge (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 27/002 (2013.01); H01H 2027/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0871188 A1 19981014; EP 0871188 B1 20000906; EP 0871188 B2 20050810; AT 196212 T 20000915; DE 69703026 D1 20001012; DE 69703026 T2 20010503; DE 69703026 T3 20060629; ES 2151700 T3 20010101; ES 2151700 T5 20051216; IT 1292975 B1 19990211; IT VI970054 A1 19981012; IT VI970054 D0 19970411

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-05-05 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-12-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2005-08-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-08-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COMEPI S.R.L

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-08-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EUCHNER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COMEPI S.R.L

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151700 T3

2000-11-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MAROSCIA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703026 20001012

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-09-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196212 T 20000915

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991123

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990304

1999-06-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI