Global Patent Index - EP 0871250 A3

EP 0871250 A3 2000-03-01 - Terminal suitable for live or dead working, especially terminal for an arching protection device or an overload cut-out

Title (en)

Terminal suitable for live or dead working, especially terminal for an arching protection device or an overload cut-out

Title (de)

Anschluss zum Arbeiten unter Spannung oder ohne Spannung, insbesondere Anschluss für eine Lichtbogenschutzvorrichtung oder Überlastungssicherung

Title (fr)

Borne convenant pour un travail sous tension ou hors tension, notamment borne pour un dispositif de protection contre les arcs électriques ou coupe-circuit de surcharge

Publication

EP 0871250 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98201001 A

Priority

FI 971438 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0871250A2] The invention relates to a terminal or connector for an arching protection device or an overload cut-out or a branching, comprising a body (1), an open-sided slot (3) in the body for receiving a cable (6), a threaded (10) prong-like member (2), and a clamp element (7) which grips the prong-like member (2) and is movable into the slot (3) by turning the prong-like member or by means of a spring for clamping the cable (6) within the slot and for establishing a contact between the cable (6) to be protected and the prong-like member (2). Along the top side of the slot (3) opposite to the clamp element (7), the body (1) extends to provide a claw (4), partially defining the open side of the slot (3) and spaced from the clamp element (7) by a distance lengthwise of the slot (3), said claw (4) defining an open-bottom catch slot or catch hook (5) for receiving the cable (6) in a direction transverse to the receiving slot (3), from which the cable is brought into the receiving slot (3) by turning the body (1). When the cable (6) is in place in the receiving slot (3), said claw (4) takes up the tightening torque upon clamping the terminal or connector on the cable. The terminal or connector is applicable for installation from the ground by means of a long shaft suitable for live or dead working. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 11/14; H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/14 (2013.01); H01R 4/2408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0871250 A2 19981014; EP 0871250 A3 20000301; FI 101913 B1 19980915; FI 101913 B 19980915; FI 971438 A0 19970407; HR P980194 A2 19981231; NO 981563 A 19981008; NO 981563 D0 19980406; PL 325663 A1 19981012; RO 118344 B1 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010921

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IE PT SE

2000-11-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000901

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 11/14 A, 7H 01R 4/24 B, 7H 01R 11/15 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE PT SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI