Global Patent Index - EP 0871253 B1

EP 0871253 B1 2001-12-12 - Lock detection connector

Title (en)

Lock detection connector

Title (de)

Verbinder mit Verriegelungserkennung

Title (fr)

Connecteur de détection de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0871253 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98110335 A

Priority

  • EP 94116642 A
  • JP 34003393 A
  • JP 34433193 A
  • JP 7459993 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0657968A1] Lock detecting terminals are disposed on one of connector housings that are engageable with each other, and a short circuit terminal is disposed on the other connector housing, the short circuit terminal serving to short-circuit the lock detecting terminals upon engagement of both housings. The lock detecting terminals are arranged so as to extend along an inner wall surface of the housing in such a manner that the distal ends thereof are not contact with the edge portion of the engagement opening of the housing. As a result of this construction, the lock detecting terminals will no longer be deformed while caught by the edge portion of the housing even when the housing is being engaged with the housing misaligned. Furthermore, the one connector has the short circuit electrode exposed to the outside and has a cover movable between a protecting position and an opening position, the protecting position being such a position as to allow the cover to cover the short circuit electrode, the opening position being such a position as to allow the cover to expose the short circuit electrode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629; H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/641 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7032 (2013.01); H01R 13/641 (2013.01); H01R 13/6272 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0657968 A1 19950614; EP 0657968 B1 19990107; DE 69415786 D1 19990218; DE 69415786 T2 19990805; DE 69429461 D1 20020124; DE 69429461 T2 20020627; EP 0871253 A2 19981014; EP 0871253 A3 19990203; EP 0871253 B1 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031021

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031021

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429461 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 657968

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-05-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990318

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-10-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 657968

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB