Global Patent Index - EP 0871264 B1

EP 0871264 B1 2000-02-09 - Lamp base for two pin lamp

Title (en)

Lamp base for two pin lamp

Title (de)

Fassung für Zweistiftlampen

Title (fr)

Socle de lampe pour lampe avec deux broches

Publication

EP 0871264 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118610 A

Priority

DE 29706525 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0871264A1] The lamp holder has an insulating housing (10) with chambers receiving contacts for contacting the pin contacts (24) of the lamp, which each has an enlarged head (25) at its free end. The pin contacts are inserted in the chambers via curved openings having a first section which is wider than the enlarged head and a second section which is narrower than the enlarged head but wider than the width of the contact pin. The lamp is rotated after insertion of the pin contacts in wider ends of the openings, with the surface of the lamp supporting the contact pins brought into engagement with a stop surface (11) of the lamp holder housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/06; H01R 33/08; H01R 33/945

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/06 (2006.01); H01R 33/08 (2006.01); H01R 33/945 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/0809 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29706525 U1 19970710; DE 59701112 D1 20000316; DK 0871264 T3 20000515; EP 0871264 A1 19981014; EP 0871264 B1 20000209; US 6045387 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151027

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-07-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151027

2016-05-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151031

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701112 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2000-02-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981228

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981110

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

1998-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI