Global Patent Index - EP 0871480 A4

EP 0871480 A4 2001-04-04 - T CELLS MEDIATING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

T CELLS MEDIATING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

T-ZELLEN ZUR VERMITTLUNG EINER IMMUNANTWORT UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

LYMPHOCYTES T DECLENCHANT UNE REACTION IMMUNITAIRE ET METHODES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0871480 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97912648 A

Priority

  • US 9715741 W
  • US 2700296 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814206A1] The present invention is directed to T cells, compositions, and methos of obtaining and using the same, including and not limited to methods of treating cancer. The methods of the present invention include inter alia: a method of generating T cells capable of infiltrating a tumor of a human and participating in an immune response against the tumor; and a method of treating cancer comprising administering to a human afflicted with a tumor a therapeutically effective amount of T cells that mediate tumor regression, the T cells having been either isolated from the tumor of the human after immunization of the human with a composition comprising hapten-modified tumor cells and/or expanded in vitro from T cells thus isolated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/06; C07K 14/705; G01N 33/574

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4748 (2013.01); G01N 33/57484 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0668350 A1 19950823 - AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]
  • [YDX] WEIDMANN E ET AL.: "Evidence for oligoclonal T-cell response in a metastasis of renal cell carcinoma responding to vaccination with autologous tumor cells and transfer of in vitro-sensitized vaccine-draining lymph node lymphocytes.", CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 53, no. 20, 1993, pages 4745 - 4749, XP002150949
  • [YX] SATO T: "Active specific immunotherapy with hapten-modified autologous melanoma cell vaccine.", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY IMMUNOTHERAPY, vol. 43, no. 3, 1996, pages 174 - 179, XP000953008
  • [A] SENSI M ET AL.: "Cytotoxic T-lymphocyte clones from different patients display limited T-cell-receptor variable-region gene usage in HLA-A2-restricted recognition of the melanoma antigen Melan-A/MART-1.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, vol. 92, no. 12, 1 June 1995 (1995-06-01), pages 5674 - 5678, XP002143225
  • [A] CAIGNARD A ET AL: "In situ demonstration of renal-cell-carcinoma-specific T-cell clones.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, vol. 66, no. 4, 1996, pages 564 - 570, XP002159122
  • [PX] SENSI M ET AL.: "Clonal expansion of T lymphocytes in human melanoma metastases after treatment with a hapten-modified autologous tumor vaccine.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, vol. 99, no. 4, 15 February 1997 (1997-02-15), pages 710 - 717, XP000953042
  • See also references of WO 9814206A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814206 A1 19980409; AU 4976697 A 19980424; CA 2242590 A1 19980409; EP 0871480 A1 19981021; EP 0871480 A4 20010404; IL 125747 D0 19990411; NZ 330995 A 20001222; PL 328790 A1 19990215

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010615

2001-04-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 5/06 A, 7G 01N 33/574 B, 7C 07K 14/705 B

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981001

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980714;LT PAYMENT 980714;LV PAYMENT 980714;RO PAYMENT 980714;SI PAYMENT 980714