Global Patent Index - EP 0871495 A4

EP 0871495 A4 2000-09-13 - REDIRECTION OF CELLULAR IMMUNITY BY RECEPTOR CHIMERAS

Title (en)

REDIRECTION OF CELLULAR IMMUNITY BY RECEPTOR CHIMERAS

Title (de)

RICHTUNGSÄNDERUNG DER ZELLULÄREN IMMUNITÄT DURCH REZEPTORCHIMÄREN

Title (fr)

REORIENTATION DE L'IMMUNITE CELLULAIRE AU MOYEN DE RECEPTEURS CHIMERIQUES

Publication

EP 0871495 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96904498 A

Priority

  • US 9601056 W
  • US 39417695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9625953A1] Disclosed is a method of directing a cellular response in a mammal by expressing in a cell of the mammal at least two chimeric receptors which trigger the specific recognition and destruction of an infective agent, a cell infected with an infective agent, a tumor or cancerous cell, or an autoimmune-generated cell. One of the expressed chimeric receptors includes an extracellular portion which is capable of specifically recognizing and binding the target cell or target infective agent and an intracellular or transmembrane portion which is capable of signalling the therapeutic cell to destroy a receptor-bound target cell or a receptor-bound target infective agent; and the second chimeric receptor includes an extracellular portion which is capable of specifically recognizing and binding the target cell or target infective agent and an intracellular portion which is derived from CD28. Also disclosed are pairs of useful chimeric receptors, cells which express the chimeric receptors, and DNA encoding the chimeric receptors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/705; C12N 5/00; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/725 (2006.01); C07K 14/73 (2006.01); C07K 14/735 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/06 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/7051 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 14/70503 (2013.01); C07K 14/70514 (2013.01); C07K 14/70535 (2013.01); C07K 16/28 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9626265 A1 19960829 - GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 9215322 A1 19920917 - GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]
  • [AD] ROMEO C ET AL: "ACTIVATION OF IMMUNE SYSTEM EFFECTOR FUNCTION BY T-CELL OR FC RECEPTOR INTRACELLULAR DOMAINS", COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMPOSIA ON QUANTITATIVE BIOLOGY,US,NEW YORK, NY, vol. 57, 1992, pages 117 - 125, XP000647674
  • See also references of WO 9625953A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9625953 A1 19960829; AT 297986 T 20050715; AU 4858896 A 19960911; AU 708339 B2 19990805; CA 2209300 A1 19960829; CA 2209300 C 20110628; CZ 295428 B6 20050817; CZ 9702599 A3 19980513; DE 69634855 D1 20050721; DE 69634855 T2 20060518; DK 0871495 T3 20051017; EP 0871495 A1 19981021; EP 0871495 A4 20000913; EP 0871495 B1 20050615; ES 2245456 T3 20060101; FI 119757 B 20090313; FI 973437 A0 19970821; FI 973437 A 19971016; HU 225688 B1 20070628; HU 9801873 A2 19981130; HU 9801873 A3 20000828; JP 4170390 B2 20081022; JP H11505409 A 19990521; NO 323632 B1 20070618; NO 973864 A 19971022; NO 973864 D0 19970822; NZ 302513 A 19991129; NZ 337002 A 20050729; PT 871495 E 20051031; RU 2167676 C2 20010527; ZA 9601477 B 19970203

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160126

2016-06-17 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20050402617

- Effective date: 20160126

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-05-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160124

2016-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 297986 T

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-03-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-02-24 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-02-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160124

2016-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-01 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-02-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-01-27 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160124

2016-01-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69634855

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20141209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245456 T3

2005-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-10-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-09-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050402617

2005-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69634855 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2000-09-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 07K 14/705 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970924

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE