Global Patent Index - EP 0871518 A4

EP 0871518 A4 2001-05-09 - FIRE-FIGHTING ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLE

Title (en)

FIRE-FIGHTING ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLE

Title (de)

GELÄNDEGÄNGIGES BRANDSCHUTZFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

VEHICULE TOUT-TERRAIN DE LUTTE CONTRE LES INCENDIES

Publication

EP 0871518 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95943669 A

Priority

US 9515770 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 27/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

AU 4508696 A 19970627; AU 720081 B2 20000525; DE 69533452 D1 20041007; EP 0871518 A1 19981021; EP 0871518 A4 20010509; EP 0871518 B1 20040901; JP 2000501958 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041205

2004-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041212

2004-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041205

2004-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69533452 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030404

2001-05-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980617

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT