Global Patent Index - EP 0871643 A4

EP 0871643 A4 2000-12-06 - ANTI-VIRAL GUANOSINE-RICH OLIGONUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

ANTI-VIRAL GUANOSINE-RICH OLIGONUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

ANTIVIRALE GUANOSINEREICHE OLIGONUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES ANTIVIRAUX RICHES EN GUANOSINE

Publication

EP 0871643 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96930490 A

Priority

  • US 9611786 W
  • US 150595 P
  • US 53516895 A
  • US 1400796 P
  • US 1627196 P
  • US 1571496 P
  • US 1368896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703997A1] A method and compositions for treating viral infection in vitro and in vivo using a guanosine-rich oligonucleotide. The oligonucleotides have sufficient guanosine to form a guanosine tetrad. Also provided are oligonucleotides of at least two runs of at least two guanosines. Also provided are guanosine-rich oligonucleotides and methods for treating viral infections in humans, and a method for designing guanosine-rich oligonucleotides having anti-viral activity and integrase inhibition activity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/00; A61K 31/70; C07H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/7115 (2013.01); A61K 31/711 (2013.01); A61K 31/7125 (2013.01); C07H 21/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/1132 (2013.01); C12N 15/1133 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/151 (2013.01); C12N 2310/18 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01); C12N 2310/321 (2013.01); C12N 2310/33 (2013.01); C12N 2310/335 (2013.01); C12N 2310/351 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3515 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3521

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 9425037 A1 19941110 - TRIPLEX PHARMA CORP [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 9408053 A1 19940414 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
  • [DX] RANDO R F ET AL: "SUPPRESSION OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 ACTIVITY IN VITRO BY OLIGONUCLEOTIDES WHICH FORM INTRAMOLECULAR TETRADS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 270, no. 4, 27 January 1995 (1995-01-27), pages 1754 - 1760, XP002068457, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [X] MOUSCADET JEAN-FRANCOIS ET AL: "Triplex-mediated inhibition of HIV DNA integration in vitro.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 269, no. 34, 1994, pages 21635 - 21638, XP002148820, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [A] FUJIHASHI T ET AL: "ANTIVIRAL ACTION OF OLIGODEOXYGUANYLIC ACIDS AGAINST HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE I", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, vol. 11, no. 4, April 1995 (1995-04-01), pages 461 - 471, XP002068239, ISSN: 0889-2229
  • [DPX] BISHOP JEFFREY S ET AL: "Intramolecular G-quartet motifs confer nuclease resistance to a potent anti-HIV oligonucleotide.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 271, no. 10, 8 March 1996 (1996-03-08), pages 5698 - 5703, XP002148821, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [DPX] OJWANG JOSHUA O ET AL: "T30177, an oligonucleotide stabilized by an intramolecular guanosine, Octet, is a potent inhibitor of laboratory strains, and clinical isolates of human immunodeficiency virus type 1.", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, vol. 39, no. 11, November 1995 (1995-11-01), pages 2426 - 2435, XP000946679, ISSN: 0066-4804
  • [T] MAZUMDER ABHIJIT ET AL: "Inhibition of the human immunodeficiency virus type 1 integrase by guanosine quartet structures.", BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 35, no. 43, 29 October 1996 (1996-10-29), pages 13762 - 13771, XP002148822, ISSN: 0006-2960
  • See also references of WO 9703997A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703997 A1 19970206; AU 6950696 A 19970218; AU 725936 B2 20001026; CA 2227867 A1 19970206; EP 0871643 A1 19981021; EP 0871643 A4 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050508

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030811

2000-12-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980216

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE