Global patent index - EP 0871659 A4

EP 0871659 A4 2000-04-26 - FUSION PROTEINS COMPRISING CELL CYCLE REGULATORY PROTEINS

Title (en)

FUSION PROTEINS COMPRISING CELL CYCLE REGULATORY PROTEINS

Title (de)

FUSIONSPROTEINE, DIE ZELLZYKLUS-REGULIERENDE PROTEINE ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

PROTEINES DE FUSION COMPRENANT DES PROTEINES REGULATRICES DU CYCLE CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 0871659 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97901350 A

Priority

  • US 9700140 W
  • US 962996 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9725345A1] The present invention provides novel fusion proteins comprising cyclins and CDKs. A preferred embodiment of the invention provides fusion proteins comprising human cyclin D1 and human CDK4. The fusion proteins of the invention optionally contain modifications, which facilitate their purification. Addition of histidine residues to selected constructs allows purification via immobilized metal affinity chromatography. Antigenic determinants allowing monoclonal antibody-based affinity chromatography purification are provided in selected embodiments of the invention. Protease cleavage sites are incorporated in selected constructs to allow cleavage of the regions incorporated in the cyclin-CDK fusion proteins for purification. Additional modifications which facilitate purification include strepavadin binding domains and antigenic determinants for antibody affinity chromatography.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/00; C07H 21/04; C12N 9/12; C12P 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1205 (2013.01); C07K 14/4738 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] TAM, S.W. ET AL.: "Differential expression and regulation of Cyclin D1 protein in normal and tumor human cells: association with Cdk4 is required for Cyclin D1 function in G1 progression", ONCOGENE, vol. 9, no. 9, September 1994 (1994-09-01), pages 2663 - 2674, XP000864419
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002131313, Database accession no. P24385
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002131314, Database accession no. P11802
  • [T] RAO, R.N. ET AL.: "Conditional transformation of rat embryo fibroblast cells by a cyclin D1-cdk4 fusion gene", ONCOGENE, vol. 18, no. 46, November 1999 (1999-11-01), pages 6343 - 6356, XP000870164
  • See also references of WO 9725345A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9725345 A1 19970717; AU 1526897 A 19970801; CA 2241849 A1 19970717; EP 0871659 A1 19981021; EP 0871659 A4 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2001-02-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE